TX HB3582 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to agriculture, including the regulation of seed by a political subdivision and the abolition of certain entities associated with the Department of Agriculture.
Title
Relating to agriculture, including the regulation of seed by a political subdivision and the abolition of certain entities associated with the Department of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Animals
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Health
Health--Rural
Political Subdivisions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Animals
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Health
Health--Rural
Political Subdivisions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions