TX HB357 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-30 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-30 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirements to access the online tracker of an application for a ballot to be voted by mail and to the date of runoff elections.
Title
Relating to the requirements to access the online tracker of an application for a ballot to be voted by mail and to the date of runoff elections.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. Reggie Smith [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Josey Garcia [D] |
Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2234 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#612 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#612 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 706 |
2023-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2023-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#2234 |
2023-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2023-05-28 | House | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 2435 |
2023-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2023-05-25 | House | House appoints conferees |
2023-05-25 | House | House requests conference committee |
2023-05-25 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2023-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#612 |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Elections |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |