TX HB3562 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to durable powers of attorney and the construction of certain powers conferred in those durable powers of attorney.
Title
Relating to durable powers of attorney and the construction of certain powers conferred in those durable powers of attorney.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2023-05-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1650 |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
GUARDIANS & WARDS
Probate
Probate--Durable Power of Attorney
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Business & Commerce--General
GUARDIANS & WARDS
Probate
Probate--Durable Power of Attorney
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts