TX HB3555 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Transferred to Calendars Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Transferred to Calendars Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an innovation grant program for community faith-based programs that collaborate with the Department of Family and Protective Services to improve foster care.
Title
Relating to an innovation grant program for community faith-based programs that collaborate with the Department of Family and Protective Services to improve foster care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
Governor
Religion
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
Governor
Religion