TX HB3540 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the creation of a statewide initiative to increase independent, affordable housing for elderly or homeless persons and persons with disabilities.
Title
Relating to the creation of a statewide initiative to increase independent, affordable housing for elderly or homeless persons and persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-02 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Aging
Energy
Energy--Conservation
Housing
Housing--Disabled Persons
Housing--General
Housing--Homeless Persons
TEXAS HOUSING INDEPENDENCE CAMPAIGN
Energy
Energy--Conservation
Housing
Housing--Disabled Persons
Housing--General
Housing--Homeless Persons
TEXAS HOUSING INDEPENDENCE CAMPAIGN