TX HB3537 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the use of money subject to restrictions under federal law that is credited to the deferred maintenance fund account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the use of money subject to restrictions under federal law that is credited to the deferred maintenance fund account.


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#763 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]


2017-06-01 Effective immediately
2017-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Finance
2017-05-09SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-03HouseReferred to Appropriations
2017-04-03HouseRead first time


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments