TX HB3530 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the towing of certain property from a self-service storage facility for disposition by a vehicle storage facility.
Title
Relating to the towing of certain property from a self-service storage facility for disposition by a vehicle storage facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1185 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
SELF-SERVICE STORAGE FACILITIES
TOW COMPANIES & TOWING OF VEHICLES
TRAILERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
SELF-SERVICE STORAGE FACILITIES
TOW COMPANIES & TOWING OF VEHICLES
TRAILERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General