TX HB3521 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the definition of coercion for purposes of trafficking of persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the definition of coercion for purposes of trafficking of persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenatePassed
2021-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-18SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-05-12SenateRead first time
2021-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#951
2021-05-11HousePassed
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-11HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-05HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-29HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3521
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03521I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03521S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03521F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03521I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03521H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03521E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03521E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3521&RcdVtNo=951&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=238

Bill Comments 750

feedback