TX HB3517 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration and business affairs of public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the administration and business affairs of public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-05-12 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-05-11 | Postponed | |
2011-05-11 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-10 | Postponed | |
2011-05-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2011-05-07 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-04 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination