TX HB3503 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to firearms training for county jailers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to firearms training for county jailers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Effective immediately
2019-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-16SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-05-14SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-05-14SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1258
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-10HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-10HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-03HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2019-05-03HouseWithdrawn from calendar (by author)
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1879 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback