TX HB350 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to discharging fines and costs assessed against certain juvenile defendants through community service or tutoring.
Title
Relating to discharging fines and costs assessed against certain juvenile defendants through community service or tutoring.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-21 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-21 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-21 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Record vote | |
2011-05-21 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-12 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-05 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-03 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-05-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-13 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-04-13 | Read first time | |
2011-03-31 | Received from the House | |
2011-03-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-30 | Record vote | |
2011-03-30 | Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-16 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-16 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-03-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-07 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time | |
2010-11-29 | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Juvenile
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Crimes--Juvenile
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice