TX HB349 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of certain property owned by a charitable organization and used in providing housing and related services to certain homeless individuals.
Title
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of certain property owned by a charitable organization and used in providing housing and related services to certain homeless individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-08 | House | Amended 1-Rodriguez |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB671 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
HOMELESS
Housing
Housing--Homeless Persons
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
HOMELESS
Housing
Housing--Homeless Persons
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions