TX HB3481 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the terms of district courts in Harris County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the terms of district courts in Harris County.


Roll Calls

2017-05-20 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1450 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]


2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-19HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-19HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-19HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-18SenateRecord vote
2017-05-18SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-18SenateRecord vote
2017-05-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-18SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-15SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-08SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-02HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-03HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-04-03HouseRead first time


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments