TX HB3477 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibited adverse employment action against an employee who in good faith reports child abuse or neglect.
Title
Relating to prohibited adverse employment action against an employee who in good faith reports child abuse or neglect.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |