TX HB3440 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - Left pending in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - Left pending in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to amendment and enforcement of restrictive covenants in certain areas.
Title
Relating to amendment and enforcement of restrictive covenants in certain areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-07 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-04-07 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | |
2009-04-07 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-01 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-04-01 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests--Real Property
RESTRICTIVE COVENANTS
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests--Real Property
RESTRICTIVE COVENANTS