TX HB3439 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a school district contract to partner with an open-enrollment charter school to operate a district campus.
Title
Relating to a school district contract to partner with an open-enrollment charter school to operate a district campus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts