TX HB3425 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Committee report printed and distributed
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Committee report printed and distributed
Summary
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy taxes.
Title
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-22 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-14 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-06 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-30 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |