TX HB3420 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to liability coverage for certain vehicles provided by certain automobile repair facilities.
Title
Relating to liability coverage for certain vehicles provided by certain automobile repair facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1805 (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#982 (Y: 129 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#982 (Y: 129 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1805 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#982 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 1-Lambert |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility