TX HB342 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to eligibility for the medical assistance program and enrollment in the child health plan program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to eligibility for the medical assistance program and enrollment in the child health plan program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB637 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback