TX HB3408 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of motor fuel metering devices and motor fuel quality.
Title
Relating to the regulation of motor fuel metering devices and motor fuel quality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#582 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MOTOR FUEL METERING & QUALITY ADVISORY BOARD
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Oil & Gas
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MOTOR FUEL METERING & QUALITY ADVISORY BOARD
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Oil & Gas
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General