TX HB3401 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the certification of documents by county clerks, district clerks, and joint county and district clerks.
Title
Relating to the certification of documents by county clerks, district clerks, and joint county and district clerks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--General
Courts
Courts--District
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--General
Courts
Courts--District