TX HB3399 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirements for grant programs funded through the Texas emissions reduction plan.
Title
Relating to the requirements for grant programs funded through the Texas emissions reduction plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Warren Chisum [R] | Rep. Ken Legler [R] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Mark Strama [D] |
Sen. Tommy Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-18 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-17 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-05-12 | Read first time | |
2011-05-12 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-11 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Record vote | |
2011-05-11 | Passed | |
2011-05-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-11 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-09 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-07 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-05 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |