TX HB3372 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to rainwater harvesting systems that are connected to public water supply systems.
Title
Relating to rainwater harvesting systems that are connected to public water supply systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-21 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-21 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-21 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Record vote | |
2011-05-21 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-12 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-27 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-20 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-20 | Record vote | |
2011-04-20 | Passed | |
2011-04-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-19 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-08 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-31 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-31 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
Water--General
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
Water--General