TX HB3363 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confinement or detention of certain individuals in a county jail or other facility operated by or for the county and to the compensation to the county for the costs of that confinement or detention.
Title
Relating to the confinement or detention of certain individuals in a county jail or other facility operated by or for the county and to the compensation to the county for the costs of that confinement or detention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1329 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1329 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
County Government
County Government--General
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS BOARD OF
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
County Government
County Government--General
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS BOARD OF
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice