TX HB3357 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prevailing wage for work associated with public work contracts; authorizing a penalty.
Title
Relating to the prevailing wage for work associated with public work contracts; authorizing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
County Government
County Government--General
Labor
Labor--Wages
Purchasing
Purchasing--General
Purchasing--Local
City Government--General
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
County Government
County Government--General
Labor
Labor--Wages
Purchasing
Purchasing--General
Purchasing--Local