TX HB3341 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-13 - Referred to Economic Development
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-13 - Referred to Economic Development
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the rebate, refund, or payment of tax proceeds to a qualified hotel project.
Title
Relating to the rebate, refund, or payment of tax proceeds to a qualified hotel project.
Sponsors
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D] | Rep. Linda Harper-Brown [R] | Rep. Will Hartnett [R] |
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2011-05-13 | Read first time | |
2011-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-12 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Passed | |
2011-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-11 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-11 | Amended | |
2011-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-03 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-02 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-21 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-04-21 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | |
2011-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
HOTELS & MOTELS
Taxation
Taxation--Alcoholic Beverages
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
Taxation--Sales
HOTELS & MOTELS
Taxation
Taxation--Alcoholic Beverages
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
Taxation--Sales