TX HB3339 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain events for funding under the Major Events Reimbursement Program.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain events for funding under the Major Events Reimbursement Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General