TX HB3336 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a judge's findings when sentencing persons convicted of certain drug possession offenses to a term of confinement.
Title
Relating to a judge's findings when sentencing persons convicted of certain drug possession offenses to a term of confinement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--Judges
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
INTERNET
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--Judges
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
INTERNET