TX HB3335 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the notice required before the issuance of certain debt obligations by political subdivisions.
Title
Relating to the notice required before the issuance of certain debt obligations by political subdivisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Elections |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BONDS
City Government
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Electronic Information Systems
Political Subdivisions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Taxation
Taxation--General
City Government
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Electronic Information Systems
Political Subdivisions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Taxation
Taxation--General