TX HB3320 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Business & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Business & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the effect of recording a quitclaim deed.
Title
Relating to the effect of recording a quitclaim deed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB885 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21