TX HB3315 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authorized locations for certain tastings and evaluations of home-produced alcoholic beverages.
Title
Relating to the authorized locations for certain tastings and evaluations of home-produced alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3315 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03315I.htm |