TX HB3306 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of motor vehicle towing, booting, and storage and to the elimination of required state licensing for vehicle booting companies and operators.
Title
Relating to the regulation of motor vehicle towing, booting, and storage and to the elimination of required state licensing for vehicle booting companies and operators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#963 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
TOW COMPANIES & TOWING OF VEHICLES
TOWING & STORAGE ADVISORY BOARD
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
TOW COMPANIES & TOWING OF VEHICLES
TOWING & STORAGE ADVISORY BOARD
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General