TX HB3303 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the use of information and records acquired during a fatality review and investigation.
Title
Relating to the use of information and records acquired during a fatality review and investigation.
Sponsors
Rep. Valinda Bolton [D] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. Carol Kent [D] | Rep. Marisa Marquez [D] |
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-30 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-05-30 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-20 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-18 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-18 | Record vote | |
2009-05-18 | Passed | |
2009-05-18 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-18 | Record vote | |
2009-05-18 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-18 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-18 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-18 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-24 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-04-24 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-06 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1872 (Same As) 2009-04-29 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Health
Health--General
Protection of Personal Information
Courts--Civil Procedure
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Health
Health--General
Protection of Personal Information