TX HB3301 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to merger agreements among certain hospitals; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to merger agreements among certain hospitals; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Travis Clardy [R] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
Sen. Robert Nichols [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1794 (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1180 (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1180 (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1794 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1180 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Beckley |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1529 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Courts
Courts--District
Governor
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Hospitals
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TRAVIS COUNTY
Courts
Courts--District
Governor
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Hospitals
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TRAVIS COUNTY