TX HB3301 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the imposition of consecutive sentences for more than one criminal offense of injury to a child, elderly individual, or disabled individual arising out of the same criminal episode.
Title
Relating to the imposition of consecutive sentences for more than one criminal offense of injury to a child, elderly individual, or disabled individual arising out of the same criminal episode.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aging
CHILD ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Disabilities, Persons with
ELDER ABUSE
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
CHILD ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Disabilities, Persons with
ELDER ABUSE
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against