TX HB33 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to alternative methods of dispute resolution in certain disputes between the Department of Aging and Disability Services and an assisted living facility licensed by the department.
Title
Relating to alternative methods of dispute resolution in certain disputes between the Department of Aging and Disability Services and an assisted living facility licensed by the department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - HB 33Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-19 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-18 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2013-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aging
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION