TX HB3294 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility of events, including certain NASCAR events, to receive funding through the Major Events Reimbursement Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility of events, including certain NASCAR events, to receive funding through the Major Events Reimbursement Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1817 (Y: 119 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1000 (Y: 122 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#863 (Y: 45 N: 80 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-12 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25HouseRecord vote
2017-05-25HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateAmended
2017-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-21SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-11SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-05-11SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-08HouseRecord vote
2017-05-08HousePassed
2017-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-06HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-06HouseVote reconsidered
2017-05-05House1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
2017-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HouseFailed to pass to engrossment
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-28HouseReferred to Economic & Small Business Development
2017-03-28HouseRead first time
2017-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3294
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03294I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03294E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03294S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03294F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3294&RcdVtNo=863&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3294&RcdVtNo=1000&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=48
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=49
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3294&RcdVtNo=1817&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=50

Bill Comments

feedback