TX HB3292 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
Summary
Relating to an increase in the fee for natural gas pipeline safety inspections.
Title
Relating to an increase in the fee for natural gas pipeline safety inspections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-15 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Energy Resources | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1658 (Same As) 2009-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Oil & Gas
PIPELINE SAFETY
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Oil & Gas
PIPELINE SAFETY
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--General