TX HB3277 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sealing of juvenile records.
Title
Relating to the sealing of juvenile records.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] |
Rep. Harold Dutton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |