TX HB327 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Internet broadcast or audio recording of certain open meetings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Internet broadcast or audio recording of certain open meetings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-31HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB341 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback