TX HB3265 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the submission of certain reports by the Health and Human Services Commission.
Title
Relating to the submission of certain reports by the Health and Human Services Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#2127 (Y: 114 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1176 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1176 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-25 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2023-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-25 | House | Record vote RV#2127 |
2023-05-25 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2023-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Alvarado |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-06 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1176 |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID