TX HB3239 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedures applicable to the revocation of a person's release on parole or to mandatory supervision.
Title
Relating to the procedures applicable to the revocation of a person's release on parole or to mandatory supervision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2015-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ARREST WARRANTS
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION