TX HB323 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the award of court costs, storage fees, and attorney's fees in a criminal asset forfeiture proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the award of court costs, storage fees, and attorney's fees in a criminal asset forfeiture proceeding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2017-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2017-03-29HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2017-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2017-03-13HouseReferred directly to subcommittee by chair
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-15HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback