TX HB3224 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study on the creation of a defense under the Solid Waste Disposal Act for persons engaged in certain recycling transactions.
Title
Relating to a study on the creation of a defense under the Solid Waste Disposal Act for persons engaged in certain recycling transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1870 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#790 (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#790 (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1870 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#790 |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-29 | House | Amended 1-Lozano |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Environment
Environment--Recycling
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Environment
Environment--Recycling
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON