TX HB3220 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-31 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-31 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Summary
Relating to the applicability of certain laws to open-enrollment charter schools.
Title
Relating to the applicability of certain laws to open-enrollment charter schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-29 | Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-29 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Amended | |
2009-05-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-26 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Education | |
2009-05-14 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-13 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-06 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-01 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-01 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Labor
Labor--Workers' Compensation
Political Subdivisions
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Labor
Labor--Workers' Compensation
Political Subdivisions