TX HB322 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the expunction of arrest records and files for certain veterans and the waiver of fees and costs charged for the expunction and to the eligibility of certain victims of trafficking of persons for an order of nondisclosure.
Title
Relating to the expunction of arrest records and files for certain veterans and the waiver of fees and costs charged for the expunction and to the eligibility of certain victims of trafficking of persons for an order of nondisclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-27 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1937 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#223 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#223 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-27 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-27 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-12 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-12 | House | Passed |
2017-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-11 | House | Amended |
2017-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
Military & Veterans
Courts--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
Military & Veterans