TX HB322 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on November 20 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to requiring parties in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship to disclose to the court knowledge of certain registered sex offenders; providing a penalty.
Title
Relating to requiring parties in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship to disclose to the court knowledge of certain registered sex offenders; providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-07 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-27 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-11-20 | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Family
Family--Parent & Child
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Family
Family--Parent & Child
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL OFFENDERS