TX HB3201 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the severance tax exemption for oil and gas produced from certain inactive wells.
Title
Relating to the severance tax exemption for oil and gas produced from certain inactive wells.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |