TX HB3200 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the administration, operation, and regulation of credit unions.
Title
Relating to the administration, operation, and regulation of credit unions.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Allan Ritter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1647 (Same As) 2009-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar