TX HB320 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-21 - Withdrawn from schedule
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-21 - Withdrawn from schedule
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to equipping certain K-9 law enforcement vehicles with heat alarm systems.
Title
Relating to equipping certain K-9 law enforcement vehicles with heat alarm systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | Withdrawn from schedule | |
2011-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | |
2011-04-15 | Subcommittee members named | |
2011-04-15 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time | |
2010-11-18 | Filed |
Subjects
Animals
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB320 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB00320I.htm |